This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 02:34:10 (UTC).

GABRIELA CABRERA VS CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 GABRIELA CABRERA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0287

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA GABRIELA

Defendant

CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGALLANES DAYTON

Defendant Attorney

LINK JAMES S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Answer

7/2/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/2/2021: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/2/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/2/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by California Pizza Kitchen, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by California Pizza Kitchen, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Gabriela Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriela Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gabriela Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gabriela Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Pizza Kitchen, Inc. D/B/A California Pizza Kitchen is a litigant