This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 00:54:07 (UTC).

GABRIELA CABRERA VS ABS CA-O LLC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 GABRIELA CABRERA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ABS CA-O LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0730

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA GABRIELA

Defendant

ABS CA-O LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGALLANES DAYTON

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 01/09/2020

1/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 01/09/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Request for Dismissal

2/5/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/22/2019

10/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/22/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/24/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

11/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 11/07/2019

11/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 11/07/2019

Proof of Personal Service

11/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/12/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/12/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/12/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/12/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

8/12/2019: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gabriela Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 01/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gabriela Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:36 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gabriela Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriela Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gabriela Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS CA-O LLC is a litigant