This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 05:09:22 (UTC).

GABRIEL PADILLA ELIZALDE VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 GABRIEL PADILLA ELIZALDE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5278

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZALDE GABRIEL PADILLA

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACOBSON KEVIN

JACOBSON KEVIN Y.

Defendant Attorney

VALENCIA JESSE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/9/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/20/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/20/2022

6/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/20/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

6/16/2022: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)]

5/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)]

Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

5/24/2022: Memorandum - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND ADDENDUM (JOINT)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

5/18/2022: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Docketat 4:13 PM in Department 34, Michael P. Linfield, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/20/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference Statement and Addendum (Joint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by Gabriel Padilla Elizalde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gabriel Padilla Elizalde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gabriel Padilla Elizalde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriel Padilla Elizalde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALENCIA JESSE