This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2022 at 01:54:51 (UTC).

GABRIEL ORTIZ SETTLEMENT TRUST

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 GABRIEL ORTIZ SETTLEMENT TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2635

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAPITAL FIRST TRUST COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

ORTIZ SETTLEMENT TRUST GABRIEL CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STENEBERG JENNIFER LESLEY

 

Court Documents

Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

5/2/2022: Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNotice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital First Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STENEBERG, JENNIFER L