This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:58:31 (UTC).

GABRIEL GONZALES VS INI INVESTMENT CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2017 GABRIEL GONZALES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INI INVESTMENT CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6146

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GONZALES GABRIEL

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

USLIGHTINGSOURCE

IRIS

AMERICAN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT & ENGI-

PRIMO CORPORATION THE

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

ACME DEVELOPMENT

I & I WHOLESALES CORP.

VILLA NOVA DEVELOPING INC.

INI INVESTMENT CORP.

ROES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

INI INVESTMENT CORP

MOES 1-50

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

I & I WHOLESALES CORP.

INI INVESTMENT CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HULTMAN GEORGE H. II

LOZOYA FRANK J. ESQ.

LOZOYA FRANK JOSEPH IV ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

HENKE ROBERT E. ESQ.

HENKE ROBERT ELDON ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN KAREN L.

Other Attorneys

MEEKAY DIANA GINA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Opposition

7/23/2019: Opposition

Certificate of Mailing for

8/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Order

8/2/2019: Order

Minute Order

8/5/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

2/6/2018: SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/27/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF VILLA NOVA DEVELOPING, [NC. FOR:

2/27/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF VILLA NOVA DEVELOPING, [NC. FOR:

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE TO TRAVELERS WORKERS COMPENSATION INSURANCE PER LABOR CODE 3853

6/1/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE TO TRAVELERS WORKERS COMPENSATION INSURANCE PER LABOR CODE 3853

PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

6/7/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

CROSS - COMPLAINT

6/14/2018: CROSS - COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/14/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Summons on Cross Complaint

6/14/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint

Notice of Change of Address

8/20/2018: Notice of Change of Address

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/13/2018: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

11/13/2018: Answer

Answer

12/24/2018: Answer

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/16/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses to Demand for Production of Documents; Request for Sanctions) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant/Cross-Complainant/Cross-Defendant's Moti...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketOrder (Court Order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to an Independent Calendar Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Hearing on Defendant/Cross-Complainant/Cross-Defendant's Moti...)]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Bryan L. McNally, Esq. in Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; Filed by INi Investment Corp (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gabriel Gonzales (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PREMISSES LIABILITY AND NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriel Gonzales (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6146    Hearing Date: February 11, 2020    Dept: SEC

GONZALES v. INI INVESTMENT CORPCASE NO.:  ****6146 

HEARING: 2/11/20

Calendar Matter#10

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant INI Investment Corp.’s unopposed motion for determination of good faith settlement is DENIED without prejudice.

Moving Party to give NOTICE.

Defendant INI Investment Corp. moves for good faith determination pursuant to CCP ; 877.6.

On 12/18/19, this court set Defendant’s motion on its February 11, 2020 calendar, and ordered Defendant to give notice. The court is not in receipt of any proof of service showing that Defendant gave notice of the new hearing date.

Accordingly, the motion is DENIED without prejudice.

If notice is cured, the motion will be granted on the following basis:

If the nonsettling defendants do not oppose the motion on the good faith issue, a “barebones motion which sets forth the ground of good faith, accompanied by a declaration which sets forth a brief background of the case, is sufficient.” (City of Grand Terrace v. Sup.Ct. (Boyter) (1987) 192 CA3d 1251, 1261.)

The settlement is for Defendant’s $1,000,000 policy limits, and appears fair and reasonable. There is no opposition from any nonsettling Defendant.Moving Party to give NOTICE.



Case Number: ****6146    Hearing Date: January 30, 2020    Dept: SEC

GONZALES v. INI INVESTMENT CORP.

CASE NO.: ****6146

HEARING: 01/30/2020

JUDGE: MARGARET M. BERNAL

#10

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant VILLA NOVA DEVELOPING, INC.’s unopposed Motion to Quash the Deposition Subpoena for Business Records Issued to CPA, Robert W. Freeman is GRANTED.

Moving Party to give notice.

No Opposition filed as of January 27, 2020.

This action for premises liability and negligence was filed by Plaintiff GABRIEL GONZALES on December 8, 2017. Plaintiff alleges that “[o]n or about January 9, 2017 at approximately 11:00 a.m. to 11:30 a.m., while on Defendants’ property [3301 Fruitland Avenue, Vernon, California 90058], Plaintiff was ascending a ladder provided by Defendants. The ladder was placed on the trap door opening which led to the roof. The trap door opening had no top other than a canvass covering. As Plaintiff ascended the ladder, the bottom part of the ladder slid on the concrete floor causing Plaintiff to fall from the ladder to the ground below where Plaintiff suffered serious injury.” (Complaint ¶¶11-12.)

Defendant VILLA NOVA DEVELOPING, INC. moves to quash Plaintiff’s subpoena for production of documents that CPA Robert W. Freeman has regarding the Subject Property located at 3301 Fruitland Avenue, Vernon, California 90058.

The unopposed Motion is granted. The subpoena, as phrased, is overbroad. Plaintiff fails to establish the relevance of all records sought. Counsel are encouraged to make continued efforts to informally resolve their discovery disputes.



Case Number: ****6146    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: SEC

GONZALEZ v. INI INVESTMENT CORP

CASE NO.: ****6146

HEARING: 10/31/19

JUDGE: MARGARET M. BERNAL

#4

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant/Cross-Complainant/Cross-Defendant INI INVESTMENT CORP.’s Motion to Quash or Modify Deposition Subpoenas for Production of Business Records issued by Plaintiff GABRIEL GONZALEZ to: (1) M&S Electrical Engineering, Inc.; (2) Jung Sungyub; (3) MoNad; and (4) Basis & Associates, Inc. is DENIED. CRC 3.1345(a)(5).

Opposing Party to give Notice.

A Separate Statement is required for Motions to “compel or to quash the production of documents or tangible things at a deposition”. (CRC Rule 3.1345(a)(5).) No Separate Statements have been filed/lodged with the Moving Papers. Based on what was filed, the Court does not know which documents are being demanded/objected to. Defendant’s blanket Motion to Quash/Modify is denied.

“The court may in its discretion award the amount of the reasonable expenses incurred in making or opposing the motion, including reasonable attorney’s fees, if the court finds the motion was made or opposed in bad faith or without substantial justification or that one or more of the requirements of the subpoena was oppressive.” (CCP ;1987.2(a).) Although Plaintiff’s Opposition addresses Defendant’s failure to file/lodge a Separate Statement in compliance with CRC Rule 3.1345, Defendant has failed to either cure or address this procedural defect in Reply. As such, there is nothing to show that Defendants acted with substantial justification and the Court knows of no other circumstances which would make the imposition of sanctions unjust. Plaintiff’s request for monetary sanctions is granted in part.

Defendant INI INVESTMENT, INC. is ORDERED to pay Plaintiff and his counsel of record reasonable sanctions in the total amount of $800.00 ($400/hr. x 2 hr.) no later than 30 days from October 31, 2019. This date may be extended by agreement of the parties.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT & is a litigant

Latest cases where IRIS LLC DBA IRIS LAB SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where VILLA NOVA DEVELOPING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant