This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 03:35:05 (UTC).

GABRIEL CHAVEZ VS CITY OF ROLLING HILLS ESTATES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 GABRIEL CHAVEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF ROLLING HILLS ESTATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4703

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ GABRIEL

Defendants

CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE

CITY OF ROLLING HILLS ESTATES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

HAY KURT M.

HAY SUSAN M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTER LEE CRAIG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

7/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • Hearing12/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gabriel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gabriel Chavez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF ROLLING HILLS A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTER LEE C. ESQ.