Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 04:13:36 (UTC).

GABRIEL CAPRA, ET AL. VS CHRISTOPHER KANTROWITZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 GABRIEL CAPRA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER KANTROWITZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY GREEN and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3737

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY GREEN

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPRA GABRIEL

WRIGHT KRISTIN

Defendants

MEDIA GOBBLER INC.

KANTROWITZ CHRISTOPHER

ROYFIELD INC.

LEDESMA JULIAN DBA JPL MANAGEMENT

SWEATHEORY LLC

SWEATHEORY WELLNESS LLC

THE SWEATHEORY GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAWABATA BLAKE MAKOA

ROSENBERGER ELLIOT ALBERT

ROSENBERGER ELLIOT

Defendant Attorneys

MATEVOSYAN ARMAN

THOMPSON ELIZABETH M

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/20/2021

4/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/20/2021

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF RECENTLY-FILED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS CASE WITH TWO OTHERS

4/13/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF RECENTLY-FILED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS CASE WITH TWO OTHERS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/5/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/1/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

3/10/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KRISTIN WRIGHT

3/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KRISTIN WRIGHT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF GABRIEL CAPRA'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER WAIVING POSTING OF UNDERTAKING

3/11/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF GABRIEL CAPRA'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER WAIVING POSTING OF UNDERTAKING

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF MARCH 16, 2021 ORDER WAIVING UNDERTAKING REQUIREMENT FOR PLAINTIFF KRISTIN WRIGHT

3/16/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF MARCH 16, 2021 ORDER WAIVING UNDERTAKING REQUIREMENT FOR PLAINTIFF KRISTIN WRIGHT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: INJUNCTION

2/24/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: INJUNCTION

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/26/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/8/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/8/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/8/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/9/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/18/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF B. MAKOA KAWABATA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JULIAN LEDESMA, ROYFIELD, INC., SWEATHEORY, LLC, SWEATHEORY WELLNESS, LLC, AND THE SWEATHEORY GROUP, LL

2/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF B. MAKOA KAWABATA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JULIAN LEDESMA, ROYFIELD, INC., SWEATHEORY, LLC, SWEATHEORY WELLNESS, LLC, AND THE SWEATHEORY GROUP, LL

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • Hearing05/25/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 04/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (of Recently-Filed Motion to Consolidate this Case with Two Others); Filed by Christopher Kantrowitz (Defendant); Media Gobbler, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Elliot Rosenberger (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (OF (1) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS? REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND (2) MINUTE ORDER DATED MARCH 16, 2021); Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff); Kristin Wright (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (with 21STCV03623 (D-58)); Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff); Kristin Wright (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for temporary restraining order and order to show cause for preliminary injunction); Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff); Kristin Wright (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff); Kristin Wright (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriel Capra (Plaintiff); Kristin Wright (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDIA GOBBLER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERGER ELLIOT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAWABATA BLAKE MAKOA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERGER ELLIOT ALBERT