This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2023 at 17:38:58 (UTC).

G&A CERRITOS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, VS ALEX SEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 G A CERRITOS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALEX SEE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9984

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G&A CERRITOS LLC FKA G&A PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

SEE ALEX

SEE ALEX DBA KING SHABU SHABU

ZENBU SHABU SHABU A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN G. RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/20/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/20/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND TRIAL

10/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND TRIAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/19/2022

12/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/19/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCT...) OF 03/03/2023

3/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCT...) OF 03/03/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCT...)

3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCT...)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions should not be imposed on Plaintiff for Failure to Appear on 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions should not be imposed on Plaintiff for Failure to Appear on 12/19/2022 scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Plaintiff's Failure to Appear on 11/28/2022 and 03/03/2023 scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanct...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanct...) of 03/03/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/04/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions should not be imposed on Plaintiff for Failure to Appear on 12/19/2022 scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/04/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- G&A Cerritos, LLC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from G&A Cerritos, LLC, a California limited liability company, to G&A Cerritos, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAddress for G. Richard Green (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: G&A Cerritos, LLC, a California limited liability company, (Plaintiff); As to: Alex See (Defendant); Zenbu Shabu Shabu, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: G&A Cerritos, LLC, a California limited liability company, (Plaintiff); As to: Alex See (Defendant); Zenbu Shabu Shabu, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less