This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 01:22:35 (UTC).

G17 INC VS YNBE APPAREL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/07/2017 G17 INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YNBE APPAREL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2641

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

G17 INC

G17 INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

YNBE APPAREL INC

LEE KEON HO

LEE KENNY

DOES 1 TO 10

LEE KEON HO AKA LEE KENNY

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

G17 INC.

CHOI EUL HYUNG

KIM JANICE

KIM YOUNG JU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LEE SANG I. ESQ.

LEE SANG I ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PARK CALVIN J. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

RYU FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/5/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER HEARING DATE

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER HEARING DATE

Unknown

2/16/2018: Unknown

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC

2/16/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER BY DENDANTS

2/16/2018: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER BY DENDANTS

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

2/23/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

YNBE APPAREL, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (COUNT 1); ETC

3/22/2018: YNBE APPAREL, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (COUNT 1); ETC

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/22/2018: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

YNBE APPAREL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AND KEON HO LEE AKA KENNY LEE, AN INDIVIDUAL'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/22/2018: YNBE APPAREL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AND KEON HO LEE AKA KENNY LEE, AN INDIVIDUAL'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/26/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF EX PARTE NOTICE

4/26/2018: DECLARATION OF EX PARTE NOTICE

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF YNBE APPAREL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHEMENT, AND TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER

4/26/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF YNBE APPAREL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHEMENT, AND TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER

DECLARATION OF CALVIN J. PARK, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF YNBE APPAREL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, AND TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER

4/26/2018: DECLARATION OF CALVIN J. PARK, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF YNBE APPAREL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, AND TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER

DECLARATION OF KEON HO LEE IN SUPPORT OF YNBE APPAREL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, AND TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER; EXHIBITS "A" ? "C"

4/26/2018: DECLARATION OF KEON HO LEE IN SUPPORT OF YNBE APPAREL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, AND TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER; EXHIBITS "A" ? "C"

APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT- EX PARTE

4/26/2018: APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT- EX PARTE

ANSWER TO YNBE APPAREL, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/2/2018: ANSWER TO YNBE APPAREL, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment as to the Cross-Complaint) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); ...) of 05/07/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketReply (Cross-Defendant Janice Kim's Reply in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default and for leave to Defend this Action; Declaration of Mindy S. Bae); Filed by Janice Kim (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Motion to Set Aside Default); Filed by YNBE Apparel, Inc (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment as to the Cross-Complaint) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment as to the C...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Default; Filed by Janice Kim (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Hearing/Trial; Filed by YNBE Apparel, Inc (Defendant); Keon Ho Lee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketDECLAIATION OF CALVIN J. PARK REGARDING MEET AND CONFER [C.C.P. SECTION 430.41]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by YNBE Apparel, Inc (Defendant); Keon Ho Lee (Defendant); Kenny Lee (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS, YNBE APPAREL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AND KEON HO LEE AKA KENNY LEE, AN INDIVIDUAL, TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by YNBE Apparel, Inc (Defendant); Keon Ho Lee (Defendant); Kenny Lee (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by G17, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2641    Hearing Date: March 11, 2020    Dept: 73

3/11/20

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

G17, INC. v. YNBE APPAREL, INC., et al. (and related cross-action) (****2641)

MOTION OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT YNBE APPAREL, INC. FOR AN ORDER DEEMING TRUTH OF FACTS ADMITTED AND FOR SANCTIONS (filed 1/30/20)

TENTATIVE RULING

(1) Defendant/Cross-Complainant YNBE’s unopposed motion for an order deeming truth of facts admitted in its Request for Admission, Set One, against cross-defendant Janice Kim is GRANTED.

(2) Defendant/Cross-Complainant YNBE’s request for sanctions is GRANTED. Janice Kim is ordered to pay sanctions in the amount of $1,111.65 to Defendant/Cross-Complainant YNBE Apparel, Inc. and its counsel within 30 days.

DiscussionYNBE moves for an order deeming the truth of each matter specified in the Request for Admission, Set One, conclusively established, and monetary sanctions of $2,511.65.The subject discovery request was served upon Janice Kim on November 1, 2019. On November 27, 2019, Kim’s counsel contacted YNBE’s counsel and requested an extension to December 20, 2019, which was granted. However, Kim failed to provide any responses by December 20, 2019. When YNBE’s counsel contacted opposing counsel to meet and confer to resolve the dispute, Kim’s then counsel indicated that a motion to be relieved as Kim’s counsel had been filed, and the discovery responses would not be provided. Counsel was relieved recently, but Kim’s responses still have not been provided.

In light of cross-complainant Kim’s failure to respond to the discovery and oppose the motion, the court grants YNBE’s motion. The court orders matters in YNBE’s Request for Admission, Set One, as true against Janice Kim.

YNBE also requests sanctions in the amount of $2,511.65, for 7 hours at $350/hr. Although sanctions are mandatory, the court finds the requested amount excessive. Therefore, YNBE is awarded sanctions in the reduced amount of $1,050 for fees (3 hours at $350/hr), plus $61.65 filing fee costs, for a total monetary sanction of $1,111.65.

Notice of ruling by moving party.



Case Number: ****2641    Hearing Date: February 25, 2020    Dept: 73

2/25/20

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

G17, INC. v. YNBE APPAREL, INC., et al. (and related cross-action) (****2641)

CROSS-DEFENDANT’S COUNSEL’S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (filed 1/23/20)

Moving counsel: Francis S. Ryu (counsel for cross-defendant Janice Kim)

TENTATIVE RULING

The motion contains insufficient information and is very close to trial. The court will conduct an in camera hearing.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYU FRANCIS