This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 05:25:09 (UTC).

G & L SEAFOOD VS NEW YORK MART EL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 G L SEAFOOD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEW YORK MART EL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1267

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G & L SEAFOOD

Defendants

NEW YORK MART EL

IFRESH INC.

DENG LONG

NEW YORK MART EL MONTE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEDELI THOMAS M.

Defendant Attorneys

EGHBALI DORON F.

PROOS ERIC J.

STERNBERG BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2018: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/18/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/27/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DORON EGHBALI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF TO NEW YORK MART EL MONTE, INC.

3/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DORON EGHBALI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF TO NEW YORK MART EL MONTE, INC.

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT NEW YORK MART EL MONTE, INC., OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF G & L SEAFOOD, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY

3/20/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT NEW YORK MART EL MONTE, INC., OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF G & L SEAFOOD, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DORON EGHBALI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF TO IFRESH, INC.

3/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DORON EGHBALI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF TO IFRESH, INC.

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DORON EGHBALI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF

3/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DORON EGHBALI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY FILED BY PLAINTIFF

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT IFRESH, INC., OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF G & L SEAFOOD, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY

3/20/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT IFRESH, INC., OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF G & L SEAFOOD, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF G & L SEAFOOD, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY

3/20/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF G & L SEAFOOD, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY DE...) OF 03/30/2020

3/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY DE...) OF 03/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY DE...)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY DE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FEDELI IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

5/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FEDELI IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY THOMAS M. FEDELI IN REPLY TO IFRESHS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

5/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY THOMAS M. FEDELI IN REPLY TO IFRESHS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF FILING FOR BANKRUPTCY;)

7/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF FILING FOR BANKRUPTCY;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF FILING FOR BANKRUPTCY;) OF 07/22/2020

7/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF FILING FOR BANKRUPTCY;) OF 07/22/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING FOR BANKRUPTCY

7/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING FOR BANKRUPTCY

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • Hearing05/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial); Filed by G & L Seafood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (RE EX PARTE APPLICATION); Filed by G & L Seafood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Strike Pleadings and Enter Default) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO STRIKE PLEADINGS AND ENTER DEFAULT) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STRIKE PLEADINGS AND ENTER...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Long Deng (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by G & L Seafood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by G & L Seafood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by G & L Seafood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketAffidavit (of Due Diligence); Filed by G & L Seafood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by G & L Seafood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by G & L Seafood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW YORK MART EL MONTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA IFRESH MARKET is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROOS ERIC J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EGHBALI DORON F. ESQ.