This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:12:42 (UTC).

FV-I, INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN... VS ROSENDO C. LOZA; ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 FV-I, INC IN TRUST FOR MORGAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ROSENDO C LOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2216

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FV-I INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN STANLEY...

Defendants

MOLINA NELIDA S.

LOZA ROSENDO C.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NABEEL ZUBERI ESQ

Defendant Attorney

BAZAN JOHN FAUSTINO

 

Court Documents

Motion re:

6/18/2019: Motion re:

Notice

7/29/2019: Notice

Minute Order

7/29/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

7/29/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/26/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Case Management Statement

12/20/2017: Case Management Statement

Other -

1/4/2018: Other -

Case Management Statement

2/27/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/12/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order

6/5/2018: Minute Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/6/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

8/3/2018: Answer

Answer

10/31/2018: Answer

Case Management Statement

11/21/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/6/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/26/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice

4/4/2019: Notice

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Resetting Trial and Related Dates) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Reset Trial and Related Dates); Filed by FV-I, INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN STANLEY... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 07/29/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to Reset Trial and Related Dates; Filed by FV-I, INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN STANLEY... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Nabeel M. Zuberi in Support of Motion to Reset Trial and Related Dates); Filed by FV-I, INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN STANLEY... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL); Filed by FV-I, INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN STANLEY... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ROSENDO C. LOZA (Defendant); NELIDA S. MOLINA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 11; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by FV-I, INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN STANLEY... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by FV-I, INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN STANLEY... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by FV-I, INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN STANLEY... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FV-I, INC. IN TRUST FOR MORGAN STANLEY... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less