This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 17:38:39 (UTC).

FUTANG JI VS PUNTA GORDA ACQUISITIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 FUTANG JI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PUNTA GORDA ACQUISITIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are COLIN P. LEIS, MARGARET L. OLDENDORF and TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0974

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

COLIN P. LEIS

MARGARET L. OLDENDORF

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JI FUTANG

WEN FAN LING

WU YI CHING

ZHENG MINGDE

ZONG YONG

Defendants

PUNTA GORDA ACQUISITIONS LLC

GRANTAG BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LTD.

GT MADISON REALTY LLC

LANDENDOEN GARY

MADISON REALTY EQUITIES LLC

PUNTA GORDA SENIOR LIVING LP DBA THE PALMS OF PUNTA GORDA ASSISTED LIVING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GESUND KEREN E

HANLEY CHRISTINE

Defendant Attorney

CHAN CAMILLA Y.

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER (3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT)

8/21/2023: Answer - ANSWER (3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT)

Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/15/2023: Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

8/11/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER OR DEFAULT ...)

8/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER OR DEFAULT ...)

Order - ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS PUNTA GORDA SENIOR LIVING AND GT MADISON REALTY TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/9/2023: Order - ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS PUNTA GORDA SENIOR LIVING AND GT MADISON REALTY TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

8/8/2023: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Reply - REPLY - PUNTA GORDA SENIOR LIVING, LP AND GT MADISON REALTY LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/2/2023: Reply - REPLY - PUNTA GORDA SENIOR LIVING, LP AND GT MADISON REALTY LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMMURER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/27/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMMURER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

7/21/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/9/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

5/18/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Notice of Ruling

5/11/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT ENTRY OR R...)

5/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT ENTRY OR R...)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)

4/20/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/6/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Exhibit List

4/5/2023: Exhibit List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR ANSWER OF PUNTA G...)

3/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR ANSWER OF PUNTA G...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/13/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2024
  • Hearing09/24/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2024
  • Hearing09/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2024
  • Hearing02/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketAnswer (3rd Amended Complaint); Filed by: Punta Gorda Senior Living, LP (Defendant); GT Madison Realty, LLC (Defendant); As to: Futang Ji (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketResponse to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint; Filed by: Gary Landendoen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Punta Gorda Senior Living, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike: Filed By: Punta Gorda Senior Living, LP (Defendant),GT Madison Realty, LLC (Defendant); Result: Sustained in Part ; Result Date: 08/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 02/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2024 at 09:00 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Futang Ji (Plaintiff); As to: Punta Gorda Acquisitions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Futang Ji (Plaintiff); As to: Punta Gorda Acquisitions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Futang Ji (Plaintiff); As to: Punta Gorda Acquisitions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0974 Hearing Date: June 23, 2022 Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – NORTHEAST DISTRICT

DEPARTMENT 3

FUTANG JI , et al.;

Plaintiffs,

vs.

PUNTA GORDA ACQUISITIONS, LLC , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

*******0974

Hearing Date:

June 23, 2022

Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOVING PARTIES: Plaintiffs Futang Ji, Fan-Ling Wen, Yi-Ching Wu, Mingde Zheng, and Yong Zong

RESPONDING PARTIES: Defendants Punta Gorda Senior Living, LP and GT Madison Realty, LLC

Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint

The court considered the moving papers, opposition, and reply papers filed in connection with this motion.

BACKGROUND

Plaintiffs Futang Ji, Fan-Ling Wen, Yi-Ching Wu, Mingde Zheng, and Yong Zong are five foreign EB-5 investors who each invested $500,000 for the purpose of expanding a senior living facility in Punta Gorda, Florida. The initial complaint was filed on July 27, 2021, and the operative First Amended Complaint (“FAC”) was filed on January 11, 2022. The FAC asserts causes of action for (1) money had and received, (2) negligence, (3) unjust enrichment, (4) fraud, and (5) accounting against Defendants Punta Gorda Acquisitions, LLC (“Acquisitions”), Punta Gorda Senior Living, LP dba The Palms of Punta Gorda Assisted Living (“Senior Living”), Madison Realty Equities, LLC (“Equities”), GT Madison Realty, LLC (“GT Madison”), Gary Langendoen (“Langendoen”), and the Estate of Luke V. McCarthy (“McCarthy”). Plaintiffs allege that Defendants misappropriated their investments, which has resulted in a total loss of each of their $500,000 investments.

Plaintiffs now move for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. Senior Living and GT Madison (jointly, “Defendants”) oppose.

EVIDENCE

The court grants Defendants’ request for judicial notice in its entirety.

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (a)(1), “[t]he court may, in furtherance of justice, and on any terms as may be proper, allow a party to amend any pleading.” Amendment may be allowed at any time before or after commencement of trial. (Code Civ. Proc., 576.) “[T]he court’s discretion will usually be exercised liberally to permit amendment of the pleadings. The policy favoring amendment is so strong that it is a rare case in which denial of leave to amend can be justified.” (Howard v. County of San Diego (2010) 184 Cal.App.4th 1422, 1428 (internal citations omitted).) “If the motion to amend is timely made and the granting of the motion will not prejudice the opposing party, it is error to refuse permission to amend….” (Morgan v. Sup. Ct. (1959) 172 Cal.App.2d 527, 530.) Prejudice includes “delay in trial, loss of critical evidence, or added costs of preparation.” (Solit v. Tokai Bank, Ltd. New York Branch (1999) 68 Cal.App.4th 1435, 1448.)

A motion to amend a pleading before trial must include a copy of the proposed amendment or amended pleading, which must be serially numbered to differentiate it from previous pleadings or amendments. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1324(a).) The motion must also state what allegations are proposed to be deleted or added, by page, paragraph, and line number. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1324(a).) Finally, a separate supporting declaration specifying the effect of the amendment, why the amendment is necessary and proper, when the facts giving rise to the amended allegations were discovered, and the reason the request for amendment was not made earlier must also accompany the motion. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.134(b).)

DISCUSSION

The court finds that Plaintiffs have satisfied the procedural requirements associated with the motion. The court further finds that Plaintiffs have established that the proposed amendments are proper. Contrary to Defendants’ arguments, the Second Amended Complaint does not appear to be a sham pleading. The proposed allegation that adds Senior Living as a wrongdoer, in addition to GT Madison and Acquisitions, conceivably stems from the allegation that all of these entities are controlled by the same person, and so misrepresentations made by that person can be attributed to the different entities (or made on behalf of different entities). Whether these allegations are sufficient to state a cause of action is more appropriately left to a motion directed to the amended pleading. (Kittredge Sports Co. v. Superior Court (1989) 213 Cal.App.3d 1045, 1048.) The court also finds that Defendants will not be prejudiced by the amendment.

CONCLUSION

Based on the foregoing, the court grants Plaintiffs’ motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint.

The court orders Plaintiffs to file and serve the Second Amended Complaint within 3 days of the date of this order.

Plaintiffs are ordered to give notice of this ruling.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

DATED: June 23, 2022

Colin Leis

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: *******0974 Hearing Date: May 16, 2022 Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – NORTHEAST DISTRICT

DEPARTMENT 3

FUTANG JI , et al.;

Plaintiffs,

vs.

PUNTA GORDA ACQUISITIONS, LLC , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

*******0974

Hearing Date:

May 16, 2022

Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOVING PARTIES: Plaintiffs Futang Ji, Fan-Ling Wen, Yi-Ching Wu, Mingde Zheng, and Yong Zong

RESPONDING PARTIES: Defendants Punta Gorda Senior Living, LP and GT Madison Realty, LLC

Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint

The court considered the moving papers, opposition, and reply papers filed in connection with this motion.

BACKGROUND

Plaintiffs Futang Ji, Fan-Ling Wen, Yi-Ching Wu, Mingde Zheng, and Yong Zong are five foreign EB-5 investors who each invested $500,000 for the purpose of expanding a senior living facility in Punta Gorda, Florida. The initial complaint was filed on July 27, 2021, and the operative First Amended Complaint (“FAC”) was filed on January 11, 2022. The FAC asserts causes of action for (1) money had and received, (2) negligence, (3) unjust enrichment, (4) fraud, and (5) accounting against Defendants Punta Gorda Acquisitions, LLC (“Acquisitions”), Punta Gorda Senior Living, LP dba The Palms of Punta Gorda Assisted Living (“Senior Living”), Madison Realty Equities, LLC (“Equities”), GT Madison Realty, LLC (“GT Madison”), Gary Langendoen (“Langendoen”), and the Estate of Luke V. McCarthy (“McCarthy”). Plaintiffs allege that Defendants misappropriated their investments, which has resulted in a total loss of each of their $500,000 investments.

Plaintiffs now move for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. Senior Living and GT Madison (jointly, “Defendants”) oppose.

EVIDENCE

The court grants Defendants’ request for judicial notice in its entirety.

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (a)(1), “[t]he court may, in furtherance of justice, and on any terms as may be proper, allow a party to amend any pleading.” Amendment may be allowed at any time before or after commencement of trial. (Code Civ. Proc., 576.) “[T]he court’s discretion will usually be exercised liberally to permit amendment of the pleadings. The policy favoring amendment is so strong that it is a rare case in which denial of leave to amend can be justified.” (Howard v. County of San Diego (2010) 184 Cal.App.4th 1422, 1428 (internal citations omitted).) “If the motion to amend is timely made and the granting of the motion will not prejudice the opposing party, it is error to refuse permission to amend….” (Morgan v. Sup. Ct. (1959) 172 Cal.App.2d 527, 530.) Prejudice includes “delay in trial, loss of critical evidence, or added costs of preparation.” (Solit v. Tokai Bank, Ltd. New York Branch (1999) 68 Cal.App.4th 1435, 1448.)

A motion to amend a pleading before trial must include a copy of the proposed amendment or amended pleading, which must be serially numbered to differentiate it from previous pleadings or amendments. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1324(a).) The motion must also state what allegations are proposed to be deleted or added, by page, paragraph, and line number. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1324(a).) Finally, a separate supporting declaration specifying the effect of the amendment, why the amendment is necessary and proper, when the facts giving rise to the amended allegations were discovered, and the reason the request for amendment was not made earlier must also accompany the motion. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.134(b).)

DISCUSSION

The court notes that Plaintiffs failed to state what allegations are proposed to be added by page, paragraph and line number in the motion or, alternatively, a red-lined version of the Second Amended Complaint that shows what allegations are proposed to be added (and what allegations have been deleted). The court will require this information before making a determination on the merits.

CONCLUSION

Based on the foregoing, the court continues the hearing on Plaintiffs’ motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint to , at 8:30 a.m., in Dept. 3.

The court orders Plaintiffs to file and serve within 3 days of the date of this order a supplemental declaration either stating by page, paragraph, and line number the allegations that are proposed to be added and/or deleted or, in the alternative, a red-lined version of the Second Amended Complaint showing the proposed additions and/or deletions.

Plaintiffs are ordered to give notice of this ruling.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

DATED: May 16, 2022

Colin Leis

Judge of the Superior Court