This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 00:17:43 (UTC).

FULL CIRCLE LABS, LLC,, ET AL. VS C.R. LAURENCE CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 FULL CIRCLE LABS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against C R LAURENCE CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9198

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GENIUS FUND I ABC LLC

FULL CIRCLE LABS LLC

Defendant

C.R. LAURENCE CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOLUBCHIK DAVID B.

ARNOLD TODD MORRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Full Circle Labs, LLC, (Plaintiff); Genius Fund I ABC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration Re: Inability to Comply With Meet and Confer Requirement); Filed by C.R. Laurence Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Full Circle Labs, LLC, (Plaintiff); Genius Fund I ABC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Full Circle Labs, LLC, (Plaintiff); Genius Fund I ABC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Full Circle Labs, LLC, (Plaintiff); Genius Fund I ABC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Full Circle Labs, LLC, (Plaintiff); Genius Fund I ABC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Full Circle Labs, LLC, (Plaintiff); Genius Fund I ABC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Genius Fund I, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Laurence Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Morris Arnold

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLUBCHIK, DAVID B