This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2022 at 07:45:10 (UTC).

FUJII, BENJAMIN YOTA -CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 FUJII, BENJAMIN YOTA -CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4252

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FUJII GERALD MASAJIRO

ICHIKAWA KAORU

Not Classified By Court

FUJII BENJAMIN YOTA

PROBATE INVESTIGATORS

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

O'NEILL MARY LOUISE

 

Court Documents

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

8/2/2021: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

Notice - Conservatee's Rights

8/2/2021: Notice - Conservatee's Rights

Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination

8/2/2021: Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination

Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

8/5/2021: Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

Order - Appointing Conservator

7/19/2021: Order - Appointing Conservator

Minute Order

7/1/2021: Minute Order

Proof - Mailing - Court Investigation Report

6/22/2021: Proof - Mailing - Court Investigation Report

Supplement - Supplement to Petition

6/29/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Petition

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel

6/29/2021: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel

Consent - Consent to Act

6/29/2021: Consent - Consent to Act

Order - Appointing Counsel

5/4/2021: Order - Appointing Counsel

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

5/4/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Notice - Hearing

5/6/2021: Notice - Hearing

Citation

5/6/2021: Citation

Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial)

4/30/2021: Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial)

Citation - Issued

4/30/2021: Citation - Issued

Request - Initial Hearing District Court (No Fee)

4/30/2021: Request - Initial Hearing District Court (No Fee)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial) - Conservatorship; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Conservatee's Rights; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketConservatorship Care Plan/Determination; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docketin Probate Have Gavel Will Travel: SouthWest Torrance, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketWaived - Conservatorship Review Fee/Asssessment

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRequest - Initial Hearing District Court (No Fee); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROBATE INVESTIGATORS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'NEILL MARY LOUISE