This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 07:42:42 (UTC).

FU RUNG WANG VS MATTIE GRANT

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 FU RUNG WANG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MATTIE GRANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5257

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

WANG FU RUNG

GENG FULAI

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

GRANT MATTIE

BROWN C. GRANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LIRA DAVID R. ESQ.

CARLEO FRANK S.

PIERRY JOSEPH PATRICK ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CARRON PAUL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS

2/23/2018: SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/14/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Other -

4/26/2018: Other -

Answer

4/26/2018: Answer

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/18/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF LIEN FOR ATTORNEY'S COSTS

7/13/2018: NOTICE OF LIEN FOR ATTORNEY'S COSTS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/10/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/17/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Request for Dismissal

6/28/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Fu Rung Wang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Fu Rung Wang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Mattie Grant (Defendant); C. Grant Brown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by FULAI GENG (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIEN FOR ATTORNEY'S COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Fu Rung Wang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by David R. Lira, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Fu Rung Wang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Fu Rung Wang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Fu Rung Wang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fu Rung Wang (Plaintiff); FULAI GENG (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRON PAUL A. ESQ.