This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2023 at 08:40:09 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1363

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGOJEVIC JULIA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/26/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/26/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

12/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Request for Dismissal

12/27/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - Complaint, with prejudice: Filed By: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Name Extension: - Complaint, with prejudice ; Result Date: 12/28/2022 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Frontier California Inc. on 09/26/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Frontier California Inc. as to Southern California Edison Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement of Entire Case; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Personal Service: As To Parties changed from Southern California Edison Company (Defendant) to Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Management Conference: As To Parties: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Service Date: 10/11/2022; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case: As To Parties: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet: As To Parties: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard L. Fruin in Department 15 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less