This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2022 at 14:11:57 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1363

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGOJEVIC JULIA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/26/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/26/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Service Date: 10/11/2022; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing: As To Parties: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet: As To Parties: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from Southern California Edison Company (Defendant) to Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from Southern California Edison Company (Defendant) to Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint for Property Damage: Name Extension: for Property Damage; As To Parties changed from Southern California Edison Company (Defendant) to Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case: As To Parties: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet: As To Parties: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAddress for Julia Dragojevic (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard L. Fruin in Department 15 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRAGOJEVIC, JULIA