This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 01:37:55 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. VS HOT LINE CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOT LINE CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MORGAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0079

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN MORGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendant

HOT LINE CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DRAGOJEVIC JULIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/3/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

5/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOT LINE CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRAGOJEVIC, JULIA