This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2021 at 14:52:00 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. VS E & R CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against E R CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7420

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendant

E & R CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DRAGOJEVIC JULIA

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/21/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/21/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/22/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/10/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • Hearing05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Hearing05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRAGOJEVIC, JULIA