This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2023 at 00:19:37 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. VS AMES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMES CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0264

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendant

AMES CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGOJEVIC JULIA

Defendant Attorney

HENKE ROBERT ELDON

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/27/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/31/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/21/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/21/2023: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ames Construction, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ames Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ames Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department G Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ames Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ames Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less