This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2023 at 06:16:57 (UTC).

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. VS AMES CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMES CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVATORE SIRNA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0264

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SALVATORE SIRNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendant

AMES CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGOJEVIC JULIA

Defendant Attorney

HENKE ROBERT ELDON

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/27/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/31/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/21/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/21/2023: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

6/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/16/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

6/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/21/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Settlement

7/18/2023: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/19/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

7/28/2023: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Frontier California Inc. on 01/27/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Frontier California Inc. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference /Status Conference Re: ADR scheduled for 10/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ames Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ames Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department G Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ames Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frontier California Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ames Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less