This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 16:46:55 (UTC).

FRIENDS OF WESTWANDA DRIVE, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 FRIENDS OF WESTWANDA DRIVE, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3490

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRIENDS OF WESTWANDA DRIVE AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION

Respondents

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF BUILDING AND SAFETY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Interested Parties

MELKONIANS ARMEN

SHAHIN KARLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SEWELL CHARLES DAVID

Interested Party Attorney

GLUSHON ROBERT LELAND

Other Attorneys

HALL JAMIE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER

3/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER

Notice of Ruling

2/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 02/05/2021

2/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 02/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/29/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Related Case

11/4/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

11/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Request - REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

11/5/2020: Request - REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

Proof of Service - No Service

10/29/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

10/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Petition for Writ of Mandate

10/22/2020: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

10/23/2020: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • Hearing11/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 82 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ORDER); Filed by Friends of Westwanda Drive, an unincorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 3:33 PM in Department 82; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 02/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Friends of Westwanda Drive, an unincorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketRequest (for Administrative Record); Filed by Friends of Westwanda Drive, an unincorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent); Los Angeles Department of Building and Safety (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Friends of Westwanda Drive, an unincorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by Friends of Westwanda Drive, an unincorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Friends of Westwanda Drive, an unincorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Friends of Westwanda Drive, an unincorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Friends of Westwanda Drive, an unincorporated association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL JAMIE