This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2020 at 00:27:17 (UTC).

FRIEDMAN, STEVEN A. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 FRIEDMAN, STEVEN A - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0002

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRIEDMAN GAIL

Decedent

FRIEDMAN STEVEN A.

Interested Parties

KAMBERG DE MARTINEZ LINDA

SCHOMER SCOTT P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KRAMAR STEVEN D.

Interested Party Attorneys

SCHOMER SCOTT PETER

OSHER JEREMY JAMES

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - Letters Of Special Administration Without General Powers

10/22/2019: Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - Letters Of Special Administration Without General Powers

Declaration - Ex Parte Declaration of Urgency by Gail Friedman for Appointment of Special Administrator Without Notice: Memorandum of Points and Authorities

10/22/2019: Declaration - Ex Parte Declaration of Urgency by Gail Friedman for Appointment of Special Administrator Without Notice: Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Order - for Practice Administrator [EX PARTE ORDER]

10/29/2019: Order - for Practice Administrator [EX PARTE ORDER]

Ex Parte - Petition - Ex Parte Petition of Special Administrator for Appointment of Practice Administrator and Acceptance by Proposed Practice Administrator

10/28/2019: Ex Parte - Petition - Ex Parte Petition of Special Administrator for Appointment of Practice Administrator and Acceptance by Proposed Practice Administrator

Letters - Special Administrator

10/23/2019: Letters - Special Administrator

Order - Appointing Special Administrator

10/23/2019: Order - Appointing Special Administrator

Request - Special Notice - Request for Special Notice

12/6/2019: Request - Special Notice - Request for Special Notice

Creditor's Claim - Linda Kamberg de Martinez

4/21/2020: Creditor's Claim - Linda Kamberg de Martinez

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Linda Kamberg de Martinez ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (Request for Special Notice ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketOrder (for Practice Administrator [EX PARTE ORDER] )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition (Ex Parte Petition of Special Administrator for Appointment of Practice Administrator and Acceptance by Proposed Practice Administrator ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketLetters - Special Administrator; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Special Administrator; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition ($200.00) (Letters Of Special Administration Without General Powers ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Ex Parte Declaration of Urgency by Gail Friedman for Appointment of Special Administrator Without Notice: Memorandum of Points and Authorities ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSHER JEREMY JAMES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOMER SCOTT PETER