Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 11:27:33 (UTC).

FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS, INC. VS TOP CABINETS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOP CABINETS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0176

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS INC.

Defendant

TOP CABINETS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE JASON M.

SLATER BLAKE S.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

3/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Hearing09/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fremont Cabinet Imports, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fremont Cabinet Imports, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fremont Cabinet Imports, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREMONT CABINET IMPORTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE JASON M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLATER BLAKE S.