Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:43:57 (UTC).

FREEMAN,MATHIS & GARY LLP VS HTL AUTOMOTIVE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 FREEMAN,MATHIS GARY LLP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HTL AUTOMOTIVE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS KLEIN and MARK C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1277

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSS KLEIN

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY LLP

Defendants

HK AUTOMOTIVE- UNK ENTITY

DOES 1 - 10 INC.

HTL AUTONMTIVE INC- CA CORP

3601 FIRESTONE PROP. LLC - CA LLC

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC - CA CORP

HOOMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP - UNK ENTITY

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC - DE CORP

HTL AUTOMOTIVE INC- CA CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOORE LAW GROUP ( KAREL RABA (

RABA KAREL

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BOB KHAKSHOOY

KHAKSHOOY BOB BABAK

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/18/2017: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

7/18/2017: Summons

Complaint

7/18/2017: Complaint

Minute Order

8/8/2017: Minute Order

Answer

10/24/2017: Answer

Minute Order

12/15/2017: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

2/20/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

3/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/20/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/11/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/17/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/5/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Trial

10/24/2018: Notice of Trial

Minute Order

11/7/2018: Minute Order

Notice

4/9/2019: Notice

Minute Order

5/9/2019: Minute Order

Notice

6/12/2019: Notice

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Trial); Filed by FREEMAN, MATHIS & GARY LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by FREEMAN, MATHIS & GARY LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Final Status Conference); Filed by FREEMAN, MATHIS & GARY LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Trial); Filed by FREEMAN, MATHIS & GARY LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by FREEMAN, MATHIS & GARY LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by FREEMAN, MATHIS & GARY LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Other - (Order to show cause hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by FREEMAN, MATHIS & GARY LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: NC061277    Hearing Date: April 1, 2021    Dept: S27

  1. Complaint

    Plaintiff, Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP filed this action against Defendants, HTL Automotive Inc., Hooman Automotive Group, HNL Automotive, Inc., HK Automotive, and 3601 Firestone Prop., LLC for damages arising out of failure to pay legal bills. Plaintiff alleges HTL, HNL, Hooman, and HK owe $155,455.28 in unpaid legal bills, and Firestone owes $14,644.11.

  2. Procedural History

    Plaintiff filed the action on 7/18/17. On 7/23/19, Plaintiff agreed to settle the action with HTL, HNL, HK, and Firestone for varying amounts. On 10/25/19, the Court called the case for an FSC; the parties represented that the case had settled. On 2/03/20, the Court discharged an OSC re: settlement because Plaintiff stated that no settlement agreement had been finalized. On 7/02/20, the Court called the case for a final status conference. Plaintiff represented that settlement with one defendant had been finalized. The Court set the case for a CMC on 9/04/20 and indicated it was giving the parties “one last opportunity to settle the case.” On 8/20/20, Plaintiff filed a request for dismissal of Firestone. On 9/09/20, the parties appeared at a CMC; they represented that the case had been tentatively settled. The Court set an OSC re: dismissal (settlement) for 12/02/20. On 12/02/20, the Court continued the matter to 1/20/21, ordering the parties to submit settlement documents. On 1/20/21, the parties appeared, and Plaintiff requested a hearing date for a noticed motion to enforce settlement. The Court set this matter for hearing on 4/01/21, today’s hearing date.

  3. Motion to Enforce Settlement

    Plaintiff moves to enforce a purported settlement agreement with HTL, HNL, and HK, and seeks an order entering judgment against them in the amount of $44,795.95. Plaintiff provides, as exhibits to the motion, the following:

  1. Hearing

    The Court notes that there are no future hearing dates on calendar. The Court will also discuss with Counsel, at the time of the hearing, whether the case needs to be set for an OSC, CMC, and/or FSC/trial.

    The Court asks Counsel to make arrangements to appear remotely at the hearing on this motion.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HTL AUTOMOTIVE INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLMAN AUTOMOBILE GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Freeman, Mathis & Gary LLP is a litigant