This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 03:45:38 (UTC).

FREEMAN, JOAN L. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 FREEMAN, JOAN L - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LIPPITT, ELIZABETH A. and HOUSE, MARY THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3908

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LIPPITT, ELIZABETH A.

HOUSE, MARY THORNTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FREEMAN MELANIE L.

Decedent

FREEMAN JOAN L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JANNOL NEAL BERNARD

 

Court Documents

Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

9/15/2017: Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

7/25/2018: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Creditor's Claim

9/15/2017: Creditor's Claim

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/10/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

6/13/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Notice - Hearing

7/19/2018: Notice - Hearing

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

3/14/2018: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

Proof of Publication

5/16/2017: Proof of Publication

Notice - Hearing

7/19/2018: Notice - Hearing

Letters (Initial) - Executor with full authority

7/12/2017: Letters (Initial) - Executor with full authority

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

8/1/2018: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

1/2/2018: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

5/5/2017: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Withdrawal - Special Notice

3/14/2018: Withdrawal - Special Notice

Minute Order

6/7/2017: Minute Order

Order - Approving Report of Executor and Waiver

10/15/2018: Order - Approving Report of Executor and Waiver

Account - Final or Waiver - Report Of Executor And Waiver Of Account; Petition For Order For Final Distribution

5/15/2018: Account - Final or Waiver - Report Of Executor And Waiver Of Account; Petition For Order For Final Distribution

Order - Order for Probate

6/19/2017: Order - Order for Probate

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • Order (Approving Report of Executor and Waiver ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • in Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Account - Final or Waiver (Report Of Executor And Waiver Of Account; Petition For Order For Final Distribution ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Withdrawal - Special Notice; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Will (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Petition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less