Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 07:51:32 (UTC).

FREDRICK, ELIAJEO VS BYRD, WILLIAM EDWARD

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 FREDRICK, ELIAJEO filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against BYRD, WILLIAM EDWARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SKEBA, VALERIE L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1259

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SKEBA, VALERIE L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FREDRICK ELIAJEO

Respondent

BYRD WILLIAM EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Corrected CH-110 that was filed on 10/28/2020

11/18/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Corrected CH-110 that was filed on 10/28/2020

Minute Order

12/9/2020: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

11/18/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service

11/18/2020: Proof of Service

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/18/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - **Partly Granted/Partly Denied**

10/28/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - **Partly Granted/Partly Denied**

Minute Order

11/18/2020: Minute Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

10/28/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment

10/28/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

10/28/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Corrected CH-110 that was filed on 10/28/2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (**Partly Granted/Partly Denied** ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less