This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 09:18:28 (UTC).

FRANS BIGELOW, , ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 FRANS BIGELOW, , filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2722

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AYLESWORTH CYNTHIA HEATLEY

BERNARD ROSE

BIGELOW BARBARA

BIGELOW FLEMING

BIGELOW FRANS

DELEO LINDA

DELEO NICK

FERGUSON PAUL

GREG EKMAN

HEATLEY BRIAN

KAHAN ARIEL

KAHAN DANIEL

MULHOLLAND HIGHWAY INC.

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHALEN DANIEL CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

HUESTON ESQ JOHN

HUESTON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

1/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

1/6/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

12/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/14/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

12/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

12/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

6/17/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • Hearing04/18/2023 at 3:00 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Why the St...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/12/2023 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Stay on Discovery Should Not ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Stay on Discovery Should Not Be Lifted scheduled for 12/20/2023 at 03:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/14/2022 03:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Coordination Pending

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordination Add-on Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Frans Bigelow, (Plaintiff); Barbara Bigelow, (Plaintiff); Fleming Bigelow, (Plaintiff); Rose Bernard, (Plaintiff); Nick Deleo, (Plaintiff); Linda Deleo, (Plaintiff); Paul Ferguson, (Plaintiff); Brian Heatley, (Plaintiff); Cynthia Heatley Aylesworth, (Plaintiff); Ariel Kahan, (Plaintiff); Daniel Kahan, (Plaintiff); Mulholland Highway, Inc. (Plaintiff); Greg Ekman (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frans Bigelow, (Plaintiff); Barbara Bigelow, (Plaintiff); Fleming Bigelow, (Plaintiff); Rose Bernard, (Plaintiff); Nick Deleo, (Plaintiff); Linda Deleo, (Plaintiff); Paul Ferguson, (Plaintiff); Brian Heatley, (Plaintiff); Cynthia Heatley Aylesworth, (Plaintiff); Ariel Kahan, (Plaintiff); Daniel Kahan, (Plaintiff); Mulholland Highway, Inc. (Plaintiff); Greg Ekman (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frans Bigelow, (Plaintiff); Barbara Bigelow, (Plaintiff); Fleming Bigelow, (Plaintiff); Rose Bernard, (Plaintiff); Nick Deleo, (Plaintiff); Linda Deleo, (Plaintiff); Paul Ferguson, (Plaintiff); Brian Heatley, (Plaintiff); Cynthia Heatley Aylesworth, (Plaintiff); Ariel Kahan, (Plaintiff); Daniel Kahan, (Plaintiff); Mulholland Highway, Inc. (Plaintiff); Greg Ekman (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less