Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 07:31:10 (UTC).

FRANK WESTLEY MICHAEL RESHARD VS BREANA L. BARRY, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 FRANK WESTLEY MICHAEL RESHARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BREANA L BARRY, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2479

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL RESHARD FRANK WESTLEY

Defendants

BARRY AN INDIVIDUAL BREANA L.

BARRY AN INDIVIDUAL LOUIS C.

BARRY AN INDIVIDUAL JEWEL M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POURSALIMI PAYAM Y.

Defendant Attorney

SMITH HILARY W

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

12/2/2020: PI General Order

Answer

12/17/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/17/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/17/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/5/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Hearing05/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Hearing04/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by FRANK WESTLEY MICHAEL RESHARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by BREANA L. BARRY, an individual (Defendant); LOUIS C. BARRY, an individual (Defendant); JEWEL M. BARRY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BREANA L. BARRY, an individual (Defendant); LOUIS C. BARRY, an individual (Defendant); JEWEL M. BARRY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BREANA L. BARRY, an individual (Defendant); LOUIS C. BARRY, an individual (Defendant); JEWEL M. BARRY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FRANK WESTLEY MICHAEL RESHARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FRANK WESTLEY MICHAEL RESHARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FRANK WESTLEY MICHAEL RESHARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POURSALIMI PAYAM Y