Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:31:53 (UTC).

FRANK QUESADA VS SHAMIKA WAITS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 FRANK QUESADA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHAMIKA WAITS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7242

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUESADA FRANK

Defendants

WAITS CHARLES

WAITS SHAMIKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RABBAN MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

ENG LES

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/26/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

10/2/2017: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

10/2/2017: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

SUMMONS

7/19/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/19/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

7/19/2015: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PERSONAL INJURY COURT

6/24/2016: SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PERSONAL INJURY COURT

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

7/19/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/9/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/9/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FRANK QUESADA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by SHAMIKA WAITS (Defendant); CHARLES WAITS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SHAMIKA WAITS (Defendant); CHARLES WAITS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by FRANK QUESADA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by FRANK QUESADA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PERSONAL INJURY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2015
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less