This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 10:15:03 (UTC).

FRANK MCCLURE VS FCA US, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 FRANK MCCLURE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2177

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCLURE FRANK

Defendants

FCA US LLC

LOS ANGELES CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

11/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • Hearing05/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Frank McClure (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Frank McClure (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Frank McClure (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Frank McClure (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Frank McClure (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA