This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 01:14:37 (UTC).

FRANK LIU VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 FRANK LIU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2105

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIU FRANK

Cross Defendants and Defendants

PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC.

2812 MANNING AVE. LLC

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

ROES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

2812 MANNING AVE LLC ROE 2

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOOD SCOTT M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEWIS HONEY A

JACOBE MAETHA

Cross Defendant Attorney

HUYNH KAYLA

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/18/2021: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/18/2021: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Substitution of Attorney

3/30/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

4/19/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

5/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

10/6/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

10/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

9/9/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

9/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

9/9/2020: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Frank Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by 2812 Manning Ave., LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 2812 MANNING AVE, LLC (ROE 2) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by 2812 Manning Ave., LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Frank Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Frank Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Frank Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Frank Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Frank Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS HONEY A