This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 05:12:40 (UTC).

FRANK KLUTKA ET AL VS GARY ANTHONY ALONSO ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by FRANK KLUTKA against GARY ANTHONY ALONSO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5235

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KLUTKA NICHOLAS

KLUTKA FRANK

Defendants and Respondents

ALONSO GARY ANTHONY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

GAME CHANGERS

COVE HB LLC THE

Respondents

MARTIN ERIN

ALONSO GARY ANTHONY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

GAME CHANGERS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/28/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

11/13/2018: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/20/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/24/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration

1/22/2019: Declaration

Declaration

1/22/2019: Declaration

Declaration

1/22/2019: Declaration

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/22/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/28/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order

2/28/2019: Order

Notice

3/20/2019: Notice

Minute Order

4/24/2018: Minute Order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/5/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/5/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

2/23/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRCT

2/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRCT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Judgment; Filed by Frank Klutka (Plaintiff); Nicholas Klutka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Statement of the Case; Filed by Frank Klutka (Plaintiff); Nicholas Klutka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Frank Klutka (Plaintiff); Nicholas Klutka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING); Filed by Frank Klutka (Plaintiff); Nicholas Klutka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Order (re: Default Judgment); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Frank Klutka (Plaintiff); Nicholas Klutka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRCT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695235    Hearing Date: November 21, 2019    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

FRANK KLUTKA, etc., et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

GARY ANTHONY ALONSO, etc., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: BC695235

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

DEFAULT JUDGMENT APPLICATION

Date: November 21, 2019

Time: 4:00 p.m.

Dept: 56

Plaintiffs’ default judgment application is valid in all respects except Plaintiffs did not cite to the specific contractual provision, attached to the declaration of Kevin Lipeles as Exhibit A, that provides a basis for its requested attorneys’ fees as required by Los Angeles Superior Court Local Rule, Rule 3.207. Also, when Plaintiffs requested entry of default and default was entered against Defendants, Plaintiffs failed to “apply for all of the relief sought—including attorney fees—when application [was] made for entry of default.” (Garcia v. Politis (2011) 192 Cal.App.4th 1474, 1479.)

Plaintiffs’ Default Judgment Application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

Dated this 21st day of November 2019

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court