This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2020 at 17:06:47 (UTC).

FRANK KHULUSI VS LEON KATZ; ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 FRANK KHULUSI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LEON KATZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STUART M. RICE and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2926

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STUART M. RICE

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHULUSI FRANK

Defendants

KATZ LEON

KATZ SHARON

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHELLE R. DEMASON

DEMASON MICHELLE R.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF POTENTIAL ARBITRATORS PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER

7/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF POTENTIAL ARBITRATORS PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SCHEDULING OF ARBITRATION

4/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SCHEDULING OF ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HAVE COURT APPOINT AN ARBITRATOR

12/9/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HAVE COURT APPOINT AN ARBITRATOR

Notice of Ruling

11/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER APPOINTMENT OF ARBITRATOR)

11/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER APPOINTMENT OF ARBITRATOR)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

9/25/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Order - ORDER GRANTING STIUPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

7/16/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING STIUPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION

7/17/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

7/19/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STIPULATION...)

4/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STIPULATION...)

Notice of Ruling

3/4/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice - Notice Notice of Case Reassignment

2/27/2019: Notice - Notice Notice of Case Reassignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

6/1/2018: Summons

Complaint

6/1/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • Hearing01/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketList Of Potential Arbitrators; Filed by FRANK KHULUSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Status Conference (rescheduling of arbitration) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re: scheduling of arbitration) of 07/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: scheduling of arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's List of Potential Arbitrators Pursuant to Court Order); Filed by FRANK KHULUSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Status Conference (rescheduling of arbitration) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: scheduling of arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Status Conference (rescheduling of arbitration) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Status Conference Re: Scheduling of Arbitration); Filed by FRANK KHULUSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by FRANK KHULUSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by FRANK KHULUSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by FRANK KHULUSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FRANK KHULUSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by FRANK KHULUSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FRANK KHULUSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: YC072926    Hearing Date: November 07, 2019    Dept: B

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Southwest District

Torrance Dept. B

FRANK KHULUSI,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

YC072926

vs.

[Tentative] RULING

LEON KATZ, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: November 7, 2019

Moving Parties: Plaintiff Frank Khulusi

Responding Party: None

Motion to Have the Court Appoint and Arbitrator

The court considered the moving papers.

RULING

The motion is CONTINUED to December 5, 2019, at 8:30 p.m. to allow plaintiff’s counsel to contact self-represented defendants to jointly supply a list of persons to court. The parties are ordered to supply a list of persons to the court by November 21, 2019.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of the ruling and to serve the moving papers on self-represented defendants.

BACKGROUND

On June 1, 2018, plaintiff Frank Khulusi filed a complaint against Leon Katz and Sharon Katz for specific performance and breach of written contract as to the real property at 220 11th Street, Manhattan Beach.

On July 19, 2019, the court entered an order granting stipulation for binding arbitration.

On September 24, 2019, the court granted defense counsel’s motion to be relieved as counsel.

LEGAL AUTHORITY

Under CCP § 1281.6, “[i]f the arbitration agreement provides a method of appointing an arbitrator, that method shall be followed. If the arbitration agreement does not provide a method for appointing an arbitrator, the parties to the agreement who seek arbitration and against whom arbitration is sought may agree on a method of appointing an arbitrator and that method shall be followed. In the absence of an agreed method, or if the agreed method fails or for any reason cannot be followed, or when an arbitrator appointed fails to act and his or her successor has not been appointed, the court, on petition of a party to the arbitration agreement, shall appoint the arbitrator.

When a petition is made to the court to appoint a neutral arbitrator, the court shall nominate five persons from lists of persons supplied jointly by the parties to the arbitration or obtained from a governmental agency concerned with arbitration or private disinterested association concerned with arbitration. The parties to the agreement who seek arbitration and against whom arbitration is sought may within five days of receipt of notice of the nominees from the court jointly select the arbitrator whether or not the arbitrator is among the nominees.

If the parties fail to select an arbitrator within the five-day period, the court shall appoint the arbitrator from the nominees.”

DISCUSSION

Plaintiff requests that the court appoint an arbitrator.

Plaintiff contends that pursuant to the agreement, the parties are required to arbitrate before “a retired judge or justice, or an attorney with at least 5 years of transactional real estate law experience, unless the parties mutually agree to a different arbitrator.” The court notes that plaintiff failed to attach a copy of the arbitration agreement, and the court is unable to ascertain the method of selecting an arbitrator. Plaintiff asserts that he diligently followed up with defense counsel in August 2019 and proposed three arbitrators but that no response was provided. Defense counsel has since been relieved as counsel.

Plaintiff offers five potential arbitrators, but the list is not supplied jointly by the parties.

The motion is CONTINUED to December 5, 2019, at 8:30 p.m. to allow plaintiff’s counsel to contact self-represented defendants to jointly supply a list of persons to court. The parties are ordered to supply a list of persons to the court by November 21, 2019.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of the ruling and to serve the moving papers on self-represented defendants.