This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 02:49:11 (UTC).

FRANK D. CARTER, ET AL. VS UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 FRANK D CARTER, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0587

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARTER FRANK D.

MOYA SANTIAGO

Defendant

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSO VICTOR ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

SCHROEDER JEREMY J.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/8/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Substitution of Attorney

1/5/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/28/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/27/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/26/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR ADMISSION OF NEGLIGENCE

11/10/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR ADMISSION OF NEGLIGENCE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/18/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/15/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

1/15/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR TRACK IMAGE RECORDER VIDEO

2/8/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR TRACK IMAGE RECORDER VIDEO

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

3/15/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

Association of Attorney

7/9/2021: Association of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/30/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

3/27/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2023
  • Hearing10/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/16/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/30/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation to Continue Trial; Signed and Filed by: Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant); As to: Frank D. Carter (Plaintiff); Santiago Moya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Continue Trial: Filed By: Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jeremy J. Schroeder (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jeremy J. Schroeder (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 06/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/19/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 05/03/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Frank D. Carter (Plaintiff); Santiago Moya (Plaintiff); As to: Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frank D. Carter (Plaintiff); Santiago Moya (Plaintiff); As to: Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frank D. Carter (Plaintiff); Santiago Moya (Plaintiff); As to: Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frank D. Carter (Plaintiff); Santiago Moya (Plaintiff); As to: Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less