This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2022 at 03:48:57 (UTC).

FRANK CASALENUEVO VS DHF PROPERTIES LLC; A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 FRANK CASALENUEVO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DHF PROPERTIES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1581

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASALENUEVO FRANK

Defendants

DHF PROPERTIES LLC; A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LA ESTATE NORTHRIDGE AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

MILLER RICHARD T

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

2/28/2022: Case Management Statement

General Denial

1/6/2022: General Denial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/16/2022, CASE MANAGEMENT AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/16/2022, CASE MANAGEMENT AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Case Management Order

3/16/2022: Case Management Order

Order - FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/16/2022: Order - FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - Dismissal

3/16/2022: Order - Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/16/2022, Case Management and Final Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DHF Properties LLC; a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by DHF Properties LLC; a limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Frank Casalenuevo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Frank Casalenuevo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Frank Casalenuevo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Frank Casalenuevo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Frank Casalenuevo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T