Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 07:11:17 (UTC).

FRANK BARCELO VS IRENE CARMONA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 FRANK BARCELO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IRENE CARMONA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1045

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCELO FRANK

Defendants

CARMONA MIGUEL

CARMONA IRENE

CARMONA EDWIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WEINBERG YEHONATAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/4/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/11/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/12/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket1st Amended Complaint; Filed by Frank Barcelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (-Not Entered. Defts. No longer named in 1st Amended Complaint.); Filed by Frank Barcelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Frank Barcelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Frank Barcelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Frank Barcelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weinberg, Yehonatan S.