This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 12:01:38 (UTC).

FRANK AYALA VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 FRANK AYALA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1600

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

AYALA FRANK

Respondents and Defendants

MCCAULEY MARIE

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

MILLER BRENDA LEE

BRACEY SONYA

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

STEEL WORKERS UNION 7600

VERDUZCO SALVADOR

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATHEWS CHARLES T.

Defendant Attorneys

GOODWIN KEITH

WEINER MICHAEL DAVID

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B313029

9/8/2021: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B313029

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL B313029, NA4/23/21

7/7/2021: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL B313029, NA4/23/21

Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - APPEAL - NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE N/A 4-23-21 B313029

6/22/2021: Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - APPEAL - NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE N/A 4-23-21 B313029

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED 4/23/21

5/28/2021: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED 4/23/21

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS APPEAL

5/17/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS APPEAL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/17/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS APPEAL

5/17/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS APPEAL

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

5/17/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/20/2021

5/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/20/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

5/11/2021: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/30/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR COSTS AND/OR ATTORNEYS FEES

4/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR COSTS AND/OR ATTORNEYS FEES

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR COSTS AND/OR ATTORNEYS FEES

4/30/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR COSTS AND/OR ATTORNEYS FEES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/04/2021

5/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/04/2021

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

4/23/2021: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Judgment

2/23/2021: Judgment

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B313029); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B313029, NA4/23/21); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (N/A 4-23-21 B313029); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued (N/A 4/23/21); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docketat 2:27 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Respondent); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Respondent); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Respondent) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF?S APPEAL); Filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Respondent); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Respondent); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Respondent) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Frank Ayala (Plaintiff); Frank Ayala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Frank Ayala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Frank Ayala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Frank Ayala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint (2nd); Filed by Frank Ayala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint ((1st)); Filed by Frank Ayala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATHEWS CHARLES T.