This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2019 at 19:37:52 (UTC).

FRANCO BRUNETTI ET AL VS JAMES SHAW ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 FRANCO BRUNETTI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMES SHAW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7048

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FAALZADEH KAMBIZ

BRUNETTI FRANCO

Defendants and Respondents

ARTS DISTRICT HEALING CENTER

SHAW JAMES

DOES 1 TO 50

ARTS DISTRICT PATIENT'S COLLECTIVE INC

ARTS DISTRICT PATIENTS' COLLECTIVE INC DBA ARTS DISTRICT HEALING CENTER A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

STANLEY H. KIMMEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

AZAT MICHAEL O. ESQ.

AZAT ISSA Y. JR.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HODGE ARTHUR D. ESQ.

KIMMEL STANLEY H.

REIF BRANDON SCOTT

EHRLICH MARC STUART

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER AS TO INGRID SARACIONE, #11960

8/13/2019: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER AS TO INGRID SARACIONE, #11960

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS FOR AN OSC RE CONTEMPT; FINA...)

8/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS FOR AN OSC RE CONTEMPT; FINA...)

Jury Question - JURY QUESTION RE QUESTIONS 1, 3 AND 7

8/26/2019: Jury Question - JURY QUESTION RE QUESTIONS 1, 3 AND 7

Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

Motion to Compel - Plaintiff Franco Brunetti's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendant James Shaw's Responses to Plaintiff's Special Interrogatories

10/12/2018: Motion to Compel - Plaintiff Franco Brunetti's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendant James Shaw's Responses to Plaintiff's Special Interrogatories

Motion to Compel - Plaintiff Franco Brunetti's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel defendant arts district patients collective, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's Form Interrogatories

10/12/2018: Motion to Compel - Plaintiff Franco Brunetti's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel defendant arts district patients collective, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's Form Interrogatories

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for an Order to Set A Hearing

11/13/2018: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for an Order to Set A Hearing

Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time

11/14/2018: Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time

Opposition - Opposition of defendant Arts District patients center to plaintiff motion to compel defendant ADPC's responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories

11/14/2018: Opposition - Opposition of defendant Arts District patients center to plaintiff motion to compel defendant ADPC's responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories

Opposition - Opposition of James Shaw to plaintiff motion to compel defendant James Shaw's responses to plaintiff's form interrogatories

11/14/2018: Opposition - Opposition of James Shaw to plaintiff motion to compel defendant James Shaw's responses to plaintiff's form interrogatories

Witness List

12/4/2018: Witness List

DECLARATION OF ARTHUR D. HODGE RE: MEET AND CONFER PRIOR TO FILING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

11/14/2017: DECLARATION OF ARTHUR D. HODGE RE: MEET AND CONFER PRIOR TO FILING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS ARTS DISTRICT PATIENTS COLLECTIVE, INC. AND JAMES SHAW'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC

11/14/2017: DEFENDANTS ARTS DISTRICT PATIENTS COLLECTIVE, INC. AND JAMES SHAW'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC

PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

6/30/2017: PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/10/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/25/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/2/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • Hearing10/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Issa Y. Azat, Jr. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Issa Y. Azat, Jr. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Franco Brunetti (Plaintiff); Kambiz Faalzadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketJury Instructions (- GIVEN); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketJury Question (re questions 1, 3 and 7); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketOther - (- General Verdict Form); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketJury Question (re conversion); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
176 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Franco Brunetti (Plaintiff); Kambiz Faalzadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARTS DISTRICT HEALING CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ARTS DISTRICT PATIENTS COLLECTIVE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AZAT MICHAEL OMAR