This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 02:55:56 (UTC).

FRANCISCO ZAMARRIPA, ET AL. VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 FRANCISCO ZAMARRIPA, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1184

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZAMARRIPA FRANCISCO

ZAMARRIPA JENNIFER

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/30/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Alhambra Courthouse in Department 3 - Hon. William A. Crowfooteffective 01/17/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Francisco Zamarripa (Plaintiff); Jennifer Zamarripa (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 12/06/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Colin P. Leis in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Francisco Zamarripa (Plaintiff); Jennifer Zamarripa (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Francisco Zamarripa (Plaintiff); Jennifer Zamarripa (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Francisco Zamarripa (Plaintiff); Jennifer Zamarripa (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMANO MARK