This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2023 at 08:25:25 (UTC).

FRANCISCO SALAS VS BOMEL CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 FRANCISCO SALAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BOMEL CONSTRUCTION CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN P. PFAHLER and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6534

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAS FRANCISCO

Defendant

BOMEL CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARTAZARIAN STEVE

Defendant Attorney

COLEMAN CLAUDIA M

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

12/16/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

11/18/2022: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/8/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/29/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

10/3/2022: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

8/11/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MASON RASHTIAN RE SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND SERVICE OF DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

8/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MASON RASHTIAN RE SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND SERVICE OF DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

8/11/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE USE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY IN RELATED ACTION

8/16/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE USE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY IN RELATED ACTION

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING USE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY IN RELATED ACTION

8/16/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING USE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY IN RELATED ACTION

Case Management Statement

10/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

11/1/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/8/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE RELATED CASE

11/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE RELATED CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

9/24/2021: Substitution of Attorney

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • Hearing05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Francisco Salas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Mason Rashtian (Attorney); As to: Francisco Salas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Mason Rashtian (Attorney); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: Mason Rashtian (Attorney); As to: Francisco Salas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 updated: Result Date to 11/08/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAddress for Mason Rashtian (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI); Signed and Filed by: Bomel Construction Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Francisco Salas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/03/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Gourgen Babayan (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Babayan Law, P.C. to Babayan Law

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAddress for Gourgen Babayan (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Francisco Salas (Plaintiff); As to: Bomel Construction Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Francisco Salas (Plaintiff); As to: Bomel Construction Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Francisco Salas (Plaintiff); As to: Bomel Construction Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6534 Hearing Date: November 8, 2022 Dept: F49

Dept. F-49

Date: 11-8-22

Case #*******6534

Trial Date: Not Set

RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

MOVING ATTORNEY: Mason Rashtian

CLIENT: Plaintiff, Francisco Salas

RELIEF REQUESTED

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Francisco Salas

SUMMARY OF ACTION

On February 18, 2021 and April 16, 2021, Plaintiff Francisco Salas filed a wage and hour complaint and first amended complaint against Bomel Construction Co., Inc.

RULING: Granted.

Counsel for Plaintiff Francisco moves to be relieved as counsel of record, due to “irreconcilable differences,” and a break down of the attorney client relationship thereby compromising counsel’s ability to effectively represent the client.

The motion complies with all procedural requirements. The motion is granted.

Order not effective until service on the client.

Moving Counsel to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOMEL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARTAZARIAN STEVE