This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 07:15:59 (UTC).

FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ VS STAY GREEN INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against STAY GREEN INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7488

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ FRANCISCO

Defendants

JAVIER ELIAS

STAY GREEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITZ T. JOSHUA

Defendant Attorney

KOEGLE BRIAN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [FINAL RULING- (AMENDED) - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION]

9/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [FINAL RULING- (AMENDED) - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION]

Order - FINAL RULING- (AMENDED) - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/28/2022: Order - FINAL RULING- (AMENDED) - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Ruling

9/28/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

Order - FINAL RULING - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/28/2022: Order - FINAL RULING - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Case Management Statement

9/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/13/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS STAY GREEN INC. AND ELIAS JAVIERS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

9/20/2022: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS STAY GREEN INC. AND ELIAS JAVIERS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/17/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/1/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JORGE DONAPETRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JORGE DONAPETRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/1/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Complaint

5/26/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2023
  • Hearing09/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Final Ruling- (Amended) - Motion to Compel Arbitration]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketFinal Ruling- (Amended) - Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Clerk; As to: STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Arbitration: Filed By: ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant),STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference / OSC Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Ruling - Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Clerk; As to: STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Final Ruling- (Amended) - Motion to Compel Arbitration: Status Date changed from 09/29/2022 to 09/28/2022; As To Parties changed from STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant), ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant) to STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant), ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbit...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randolph M. Hammock in Department 49 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FRANCISCO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: STAY GREEN INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ELIAS JAVIER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAY GREEN INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RITZ T. JOSHUA