This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 15:53:55 (UTC).

FRANCISCO LOPEZ VS US ECOLOGY VERNON, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 FRANCISCO LOPEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against US ECOLOGY VERNON, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN, ELIHU M. BERLE and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4969

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

ELIHU M. BERLE

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ FRANCISCO

Defendants

US ECOLOGY INC.

US ECOLOGY VERNON INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVIANT HOWARD SCOTT

MOON KANE

TUNYAN LILIT G.

Defendant Attorneys

GELLER JASON ALEX

HARRINGTON ABBY

LOW NATHAN K.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/29/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

9/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/29/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Initial Status Conference Order

9/29/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS US ECOLOGY, INC.

10/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS US ECOLOGY, INC.

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS US ECOLOGY VERNON, INC.

10/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS US ECOLOGY VERNON, INC.

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/13/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

10/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance

10/15/2021: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

10/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 10/19/2021

10/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 10/19/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)]

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

11/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 11/05/2021

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 11/05/2021

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/1/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Initial Status Conference Order

12/2/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

12/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;) OF 12/02/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;) OF 12/02/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATS CONFERENCE

12/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATS CONFERENCE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • Hearing04/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Court Order Setting Initial Stats Conference; Filed by Francisco Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docketat 2:45 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference;) of 12/02/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Francisco Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docketat 11:21 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Case Reassignment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Summons US Ecology Vernon, Inc.); Filed by Francisco Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 3:18 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Initial Status Conference) of 09/29/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Francisco Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Francisco Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Francisco Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Francisco Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Low, Nathan K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELLER, JASON A