Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2021 at 12:21:39 (UTC).

FRANCISCO LOMELI VS PHARMAVITE, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 FRANCISCO LOMELI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PHARMAVITE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9861

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOMELI FRANCISCO

Defendant

PHARMAVITE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOON KANE

Defendant Attorney

SHAO ERIKA L.

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

4/20/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

10/23/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/4/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

7/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

6/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Initial Status Conference Order

6/25/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 06/25/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 06/25/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) TO JUDGE PALAZUELOS

5/1/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) TO JUDGE PALAZUELOS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT PHARMAVITE, LLC'S PEREMPTORY CHALLEN...)

5/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT PHARMAVITE, LLC'S PEREMPTORY CHALLEN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT PHARMAVITE, LLC'S PEREMPTORY CHALLEN...) OF 05/18/2020

5/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT PHARMAVITE, LLC'S PEREMPTORY CHALLEN...) OF 05/18/2020

Notice of Appearance

4/20/2020: Notice of Appearance

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/11/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • Hearing08/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint; Filed by Francisco Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketJoint Stipulation to Continue Initial Status Conference; Filed by Francisco Lomeli (Plaintiff); Pharmavite, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketJoint Stipulation and Order for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Filed by Francisco Lomeli (Plaintiff); Pharmavite, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Continue Initial Status Conference); Filed by Francisco Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Defendant Pharmavite, LLC's Peremptory Challen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Defendant Pharmavite, LLC's Peremptory Challen...) of 05/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (to Judge Palazuelos); Filed by Pharmavite, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Pharmavite, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Francisco Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Francisco Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Francisco Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHARMAVITE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOON KANE