This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 17:23:15 (UTC).

FRANCISCO J. DUARTE ROBLES VS NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 FRANCISCO J DUARTE ROBLES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1329

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUARTE ROBLES FRANCISCO J.

Defendant

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/30/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by FRANCISCO J. DUARTE ROBLES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FRANCISCO J. DUARTE ROBLES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FRANCISCO J. DUARTE ROBLES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FRANCISCO J. DUARTE ROBLES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YANG MICHELLE