This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 03:47:52 (UTC).

FRANCISCO GARCIA MAGANA ET AL VS SERGIO ROMERIO ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 FRANCISCO GARCIA MAGANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SERGIO ROMERIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2745

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAGANA FRANCISCO GARCIA

ROSALES YENI AGUIRRE

Defendants and Respondents

STERNDAHL ENTERPRISES INC

ROMERIO SERGIO

ROMERO SERGIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ ANTHONY R. ESQ

Defendant Attorney

BEAL JEREMY E. ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS STERNDAHL ENTERPRISES, INC. AND SERGIO ROMERO'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/1/2017: DEFENDANTS STERNDAHL ENTERPRISES, INC. AND SERGIO ROMERO'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

7/14/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/14/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT-PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH - AMENDED (NUMBER): FIRST - MOTOR VEHICLE - OTHER: GENERAL NEGLIGENCE - PROPERTY DAMAGE - PERSONAL INJURY

7/14/2017: COMPLAINT-PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH - AMENDED (NUMBER): FIRST - MOTOR VEHICLE - OTHER: GENERAL NEGLIGENCE - PROPERTY DAMAGE - PERSONAL INJURY

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

5/25/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

5/25/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

5/24/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Request for Dismissal

5/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

4/26/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/13/2019: Notice

Notice of Settlement

3/6/2019: Notice of Settlement

Unknown

3/6/2019: Unknown

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL;

8/10/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL;

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Francisco Garcia Magana (Plaintiff); yeni Aguirre Rosales (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal); Filed by Francisco Garcia Magana (Plaintiff); yeni Aguirre Rosales (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Francisco Garcia Magana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Francisco Garcia Magana (Plaintiff); yeni Aguirre Rosales (Plaintiff); Marcus Smith (Legacy Party) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Francisco Garcia Magana (Plaintiff); yeni Aguirre Rosales (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2745    Hearing Date: January 09, 2020    Dept: 2

Garcia Magana et al v. Romerio et al

The Court has reviewed the Two (2) Expedited Petitions to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claims of Minors (Perla Contreras, Age 9; and Marcus Smith, Age 15), and the Declaration of L. Dean Smith, Jr. filed on 12/30/19. The Court finds that the settlements are reasonable and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petitions.

The court approves the following distribution of the settlement proceeds:

Marcus Smith

Attorney’s fees (25%) $1,500.00

Medical expenses 2,822.49

Costs 772.00

Total fees and costs $5,094.49

Total Settlement $6,000.00

Less credits -5,094.49

Net Settlement $ 905.51

Perla Contreras

Attorney’s fees (25%) $1,500.00

Medical expenses 929.14

Costs 775.00

Total fees and costs $3,204.14

Total Settlement $6,000.00

Less credits -3,204.14

Net Settlement $2,795.86

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE PROOF OF DEPOSIT ON 4/27/2020 AT 8:30 AM. IN DEPARTMENT 29 OF THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.  No appearance required if receipt filed.

THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 01/16/2020 IS ADVANCED AND CONTINUED TO 04/27/2020 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPT. 29 OF THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

If Proof of Deposit and Request for Dismissal as to the entire case are filed and entered, no appearance is necessary.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STERNDAH ENTERPRISES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ ANTHONY R. JR. ESQ.