This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 02:36:55 (UTC).

FRANCISCO GALVAN VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 FRANCISCO GALVAN filed an Other lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0143

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GALVAN FRANCISCO

Respondent

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WINTERS JONATHAN D

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER DENYING RELIEF TO FILE A LATE CLAIM

6/30/2021: Order - ORDER DENYING RELIEF TO FILE A LATE CLAIM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM LATE CLAIM LAW (GOV. CODE...)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM LATE CLAIM LAW (GOV. CODE...)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM LATE CLAIM

7/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM LATE CLAIM

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MEDICAL DOCTORS & MEDICAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR RELIEF

6/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MEDICAL DOCTORS & MEDICAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR RELIEF

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF EITAN YEHOSHUA IN SUPPORT OF LACMTA'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEVING PETITIONER FROM CLAIMS PRESENTATION REQUIREMENTS OF SECTION 945.4

6/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF EITAN YEHOSHUA IN SUPPORT OF LACMTA'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEVING PETITIONER FROM CLAIMS PRESENTATION REQUIREMENTS OF SECTION 945.4

Opposition - OPPOSITION LACMTA'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM THE CLAIMS PRESENTATION REQUIREMENTS OF SECTION 945.4

6/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION LACMTA'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM THE CLAIMS PRESENTATION REQUIREMENTS OF SECTION 945.4

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE OF COURT HEARING REQUIRING COURT CALL APPEARANCE

6/18/2021: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE OF COURT HEARING REQUIRING COURT CALL APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION FOR RELIEF

1/19/2021: Petition - PETITION FOR RELIEF

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/20/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

1/21/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling re Hearing on Petition for Relief from Late Claim); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Relief from Late Claim Law (Gov. Code 946.6) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOrder (Denying Relief to File a Late Claim); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Relief from Late Claim Law (Gov. Code...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone (OF COURT HEARING REQUIRING COURT CALL APPEARANCE); Filed by FRANCISCO GALVAN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Eitan Yehoshua in Support of LACMTA's Opposition to Petition for Order Relieving Petitioner from Claims Presentation Requirements of Section 945.4); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketOpposition (LACMTA's Opposition to Petition for Relief from the CLaims Presentation Requirements of Section 945.4); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Medical Doctors & Medical Exhibits in support of Petition for Relief); Filed by FRANCISCO GALVAN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by FRANCISCO GALVAN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FRANCISCO GALVAN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FRANCISCO GALVAN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPetition (FOR RELIEF); Filed by FRANCISCO GALVAN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FRANCISCO GALVAN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINTERS JONATHAN D. ESQ.