This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 00:56:00 (UTC).

FRANCISCO FRANKLIN VS CONTINENTAL PROPERTY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 FRANCISCO FRANKLIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CONTINENTAL PROPERTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8870

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FRANKLIN FRANCISCO

Defendants and Respondents

JOHN

CONTINENTAL PROPERTY

DOES 1-50

AN INDIVIDUAL "JOHN"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RAMSEY EDWARD ESQ.

RAMSEY HADI EDWARD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/4/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/4/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/4/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/20/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/20/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Ruling

12/20/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

12/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

12/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/17/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/31/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/31/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/4/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/4/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

6/5/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

6/5/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Hadi Edward Ramsey, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Hadi Edward Ramsey, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Francisco Franklin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC708870    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

FRANCISCO FRANKLIN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CONTINENTAL PROPERTY, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC708870

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 3, 2019

Plaintiff’s attorney of record, Los Angeles City Law, moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff, Francisco Franklin.  Counsel contends there has been a breakdown in communication that prohibits further representation.  The motion is denied for several reasons. 

First, there is no proof of service of the moving papers on Plaintiff. 

Second, Counsel declares she has not been able to confirm if Plaintiff’s address is correct in the past thirty days.  If Counsel is unable to serve Plaintiff at a confirmed address, Counsel must serve the moving papers on the Clerk of the Court pursuant to CCP §1101(b) and CRC 3.1362(d). 

Third, the hearing date is not in the caption of the motion, declaration, or proposed order. 

Fourth, and most importantly, the motion is denied because it is set to be heard unreasonably close to the trial date.  The trial date in the case is 12/05/19, only two days after the hearing on this motion. 

Unlike their clients, attorneys do not have an absolute right to withdraw from representation at any time with or without cause. Even where grounds for termination exist, attorneys seeking to withdraw must comply with the procedures set forth in California Rule of Professional Conduct (CRPC) 3-700 and are subject to discipline for failure to do so.  Where withdrawal is not mandatory, an attorney normally must continue representation on the matter undertaken. The fact the client or matter proves unpleasant or unprofitable does not excuse attorney performance. The rules have been liberally construed to protect clients.  See Vann v. Shilleh (1975) 54 Cal.App.3d 192, 197; Chaleff v. Superior Court (1977) 69 Cal.App.3d 721; Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.

Counsel is ordered to give notice. 

 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.