This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 18:18:53 (UTC).

FRANCISCO CORTES VS YARNEL HAZAMIN BANUELOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 FRANCISCO CORTES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YARNEL HAZAMIN BANUELOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0226

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTES FRANCISCO

Defendants

BANUELOS FREDERICO J.

BANUELOS MARTHA

BANUELOS YARNEL HAZAMIN

TORRES MIRIAM GUILLERMINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALEM EDMOND E.

Defendant Attorneys

CARRON PAUL ANDREW

KUREDJIAN ARAM

MCFADDEN BENJAMIN A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/28/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

12/14/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/14/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/24/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/23/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/23/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/8/2021: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/10/2021: PI General Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2024
  • Hearing08/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Hearing01/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Frederico J. Banuelos (Defendant); Martha Banuelos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Yarnel Hazamin Banuelos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Yarnel Hazamin Banuelos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Miriam Guillermina Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Frederico J. Banuelos (Defendant); Martha Banuelos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Frederico J. Banuelos (Defendant); Martha Banuelos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Francisco Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Francisco Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Francisco Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Francisco Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Francisco Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Francisco Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Francisco Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Francisco Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALEM EDMOND E. ESQ.