This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 08:31:10 (UTC).

FRANCISCO CARRILLO VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2018 FRANCISCO CARRILLO filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2661

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARRILLO FRANCISCO

Defendant

MOORE MICHEL

Respondent

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NISSEN CHRISTOPHER DAVID

Respondent Attorney

AGUILERA DANIEL PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/19/2019: Minute Order

Judgment

8/19/2019: Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for

8/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice

8/20/2019: Notice

Declaration

8/8/2019: Declaration

Objection

7/22/2019: Objection

Minute Order

7/23/2019: Minute Order

Other -

7/23/2019: Other -

Notice of Lodging

7/16/2019: Notice of Lodging

Reply

7/16/2019: Reply

Notice of Lodging

7/16/2019: Notice of Lodging

Request for Judicial Notice

7/16/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Lodging

7/16/2019: Notice of Lodging

Notice of Hearing on Petition

5/23/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/24/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Opposition

6/21/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

1/31/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/23/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent); Michel Moore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docketat 1:53 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/19/2019, Notice of Entry of Judgment and Judgment); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Court Finding - After Court Trial - 08/19/2019 entered, plaintiff to take nothing by virtue of the complaint.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketJudgment ([Proposed] Judgment Denying Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandate); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent); Michel Moore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Daniel P. Aguilera [Filed Concurrently with [Proposed] Judgment]); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent); Michel Moore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketOther - (Decision on petition for writ of mandate: denied); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Respondents' Opposition to Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandamus; Memorandum of Points & Authorities); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent); Michel Moore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Francisco Carrillo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Francisco Carrillo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketNotice (of trial setting conference)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Francisco Carrillo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Francisco Carrillo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nissen, Christopher D